HI SB2039 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Re-Referred to CPH, JDC.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Re-Referred to CPH, JDC.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires mobile electronic device retailers to post written notice of state and county mobile electronic device laws and ordinances at the time of sale.
Title
Relating To Mobile Electronic Devices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Referred to TEC, CPH/JDC. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2039&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2039_.HTM |