HI SB2071 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-16 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, Kawakami, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-16 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, Kawakami, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows counties to conduct criminal history checks on employees and prospective employees supporting the liquor commission, working with vulnerable adults or seniors, and working in the field of emergency services and emergency management. (SB2071 HD1)
Title
Criminal History Record Checks for County Employees; City and County of Honolulu Package
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-16 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, Kawakami, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1022-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2012-03-13 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Saiki, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Luke, Souki, Takumi. | |
2012-03-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-13-12 9:30AM in House conference room 309. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 61) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2467) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Ihara. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-12 9:45AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-02-16 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. | |
2012-02-16 | (S) Reported from PGM/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2267) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. | |
2012-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ryan, Slom. | |
2012-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-12 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-19 | (S) Referred to PGM/HMS, JDL. | |
2012-01-18 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-18 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1765 (Same As) 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 299, 7/9/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1416).