HI SB2084 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Referred to AEN, WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Referred to AEN, WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Agriculture to conduct a market analysis study to identify the optimum mix of private sector, public sector, and philanthropic funding sources and mechanisms needed to support blue carbon ecosystem projects in the State and Pacific region. Makes an appropriation.
Title
Relating To Blue Carbon Ecosystem Projects.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] |
Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Tim Richards [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1999 (Same As) 2024-01-24 - Referred to AGR/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 2
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Blue Carbon Ecosystem Projects
Blue Carbon Finance
DOA
Market Analysis Study
Report to Legislature
Blue Carbon Ecosystem Projects
Blue Carbon Finance
DOA
Market Analysis Study
Report to Legislature
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2084&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2084_.HTM |