HI SB2100 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-27 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-27-18 5:01PM in Conference Room 225.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-27 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-27-18 5:01PM in Conference Room 225.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Replaces the current renewable energy technology systems tax credit with tax credits for solar or wind energy systems and energy storage systems. Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2018. (SB2100 HD2)
Title
Relating To Renewable Energy.
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] |
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-27-18 5:01PM in Conference Room 225. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 2:01 pm in conference room 225. |
2018-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-18 9:30AM in conference room 225. |
2018-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-26-18 9:30AM in conference room 225. |
2018-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-25-18 4:15PM in conference room 225. |
2018-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 812). |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Kidani, Espero Co-Chairs. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Lowen Co-Chairs; Brower, Tupola. |
2018-04-12 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 784). |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 563). |
2018-04-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1962-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-03-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Tupola. |
2018-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-28-18 4:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1381-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-15 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Kong, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane, McDermott. |
2018-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-15-18 8:30AM in conference room 325. |
2018-03-13 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-15-18. |
2018-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-13-18 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 95) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2871) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-18 11:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2138) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Espero, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Shimabukuro. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-18 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to TRE, WAM. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |