HI SB2110 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Referred to EET, WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Referred to EET, WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds a cap for the amount of tax credits for research activities that an eligible taxpayer and the taxpayer's related entities may receive per taxable year. Requires a qualified high technology business to be registered to do business in the State and be a small business in order to be eligible for the tax credit. Consolidates the survey and certification requirements for tax credits for research activities. Amends the annual aggregate cap on tax credits for research activities that the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism may certify. Requires certification of the tax credits for research activities on a first-come, firstserved basis to be based on the date that a complete application is received, subject to certain conditions. Extends from December 31, 2025 to December 31, 2030, the sunset date for tax credits for research activities.
Title
Relating To The Tax Credit For Research Activities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2110&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2110_.HTM |