HI SB2143 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-02 - (S) The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-02 - (S) The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the Auditor to conduct a management and financial audit of the services provided by Evercare and Ohana Health Plan to medicaid clients under QUEST Expanded Access. Requires the Auditor to submit its findings and recommendations, including any proposed legislation, to the legislature no later than twenty days before the convening of the Regular Session of 2013. Effective July 1, 2012.
Title
Medicaid Service Providers; Audit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-02 | (S) The committee on HMS deferred the measure. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-12 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Referred to HMS, WAM. | |
2012-01-19 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-19 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2143 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2143_.HTM |