HI SB2152 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-20 - (S) Referred to PGM/JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Government Operations, and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-20 - (S) Referred to PGM/JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Government Operations, and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Bans the ignition, possession, selling, and use of aerial luminaries.
Title
Fire Protection; Fire Council Package
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-20 | (S) Referred to PGM/JDL, WAM. | |
2012-01-19 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-19 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2113 (Same As) 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 319, 7/10/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1436).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2152 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2152_.HTM |