HI SB2152 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limits the discretion of the Land Division of the Department of Land and Natural Resources by requiring the Board of Land and Natural Resources to approve all revoked, limited, condemned, removed, or modified public land leases or revocable permits. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Board Of Land And Natural Resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2255) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Elefante, McKelvey, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred to WTL, JDC. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |