HI SB2188 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - The committee on LBT deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Labor and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - The committee on LBT deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Labor and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows striking workers to be eligible for unemployment benefits.
Title
Relating To Unemployment Benefits.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | Senate | The committee on LBT deferred the measure. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred to LBT, WAM/JDC. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1785 (Same As) 2024-01-24 - Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2188&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2188_.HTM |