HI SB2204 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that certain pregnant women receiving substance abuse treatment are eligible for substance abuse treatment and mental health services for an additional twelve months following childbirth. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-19-20 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2587) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-20 2:55PM in conference room 016. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to HMS, CPH. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |