HI SB223 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-06 - (S) Act 205, 7/3/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1308).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-06 - (S) Act 205, 7/3/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1308).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a police officer to order a person to have no contact with a family or household member for a twenty-four hour period, or longer if the incident occurs on the weekend, when a police officer has reasonable grounds to believe that there is probable danger of further physical abuse or harm to the family or household member. Requires a police officer to seize firearms and ammunition in such cases. (SB223 HD1)
Title
Domestic Abuse Orders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-06 | (S) Act 205, 7/3/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1308). | |
2012-07-06 | (H) Act 205, on 7/3/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1308). | |
2012-04-25 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2012-04-25 | (H) Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 803). | |
2012-04-25 | (S) Passed Final Reading. 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-04-24 | (S) One Day Notice 04-25-12. | |
2012-04-24 | (S) Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-25-12. | |
2012-04-24 | (S) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-12-12 in disagreeing to the House amendments. | |
2012-04-23 | (S) The Senate Conference Managers recommend that the Senate agree to the House amendments. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-04-20 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-12 11:00AM in conference room 325. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 752). | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Shimabukuro, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Mizuno, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs; Jordan, Tsuji, Pine. | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 679). | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Deferred until 04-12-12. | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 373). | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Thielen excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-03 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 04-05-12. | |
2012-04-03 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1503-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Herkes, Ito, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Cabanilla, Carroll, Coffman, Luke, McKelvey, Marumoto. | |
2012-03-27 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-29-12 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes excused (1). | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1204-12), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Jordan, Hanohano, C. Lee, Morikawa, Yamane, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Wooley. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Monday, 03-19-12 9:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 40) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2539) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2012-02-27 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. | |
2012-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-27-12 9:35AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to JDL. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |