HI SB2237 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 210, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1319).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 210, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1319).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the City and County of Honolulu to transfer to the Department of Education all property upon which a public elementary or intermediate school is situated. Gives the Department of Education power to acquire and hold title to real, personal, or mixed property for use for public educational purposes. Requires legislative approval prior to the sale or gift of lands to which the Department of Education holds title. Appropriates funds. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Public Schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | Senate | Act 210, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1319). |
2018-07-11 | House | Act 210, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1319). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Kong, Say voting no (3) and none excused (0). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Taniguchi . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 129-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 129-18). |
2018-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Yamane, Todd, Hashem, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Rhoads, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 1:00PM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-18 2:00PM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-18 2:30PM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-18 1:45PM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-18 3:30PM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 788). |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; K. Rhoads, Shimabukuro Co-Chairs. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Yamane, Todd Co-Chairs; Hashem, Ward. |
2018-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 778). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 503). |
2018-04-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1914-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto. |
2018-03-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-03-18 10:30AM in House conference room 308. |
2018-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from EDN/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1413-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-21 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Kong, Lowen, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Todd, C. Lee, McKelvey. |
2018-03-21 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kong, Hashem, Ohno, Quinlan, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Learmont, Onishi; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Ing, McKelvey. |
2018-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN/WAL on Wednesday, 03-21-18 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to EDN/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 124) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Harimoto, Ihara, Kim, Riviere . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2828) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Harimoto, Riviere ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-23-18 10:55AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-18 10:08AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Reported from EDU/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2513) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Espero. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Inouye, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-18 3:15PM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDU/WTL, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to EDU/PSM/WTL, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |