HI SB2240 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-27 - (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-27 - (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts members of groups convened solely to provide comments, share technical knowledge or expertise, or assist in formulating recommendations to, with or for the legislature, governor, or other state departments, agencies, or boards, from the state code of ethics.
Title
Ethics Code; Exemption; Advisory Group; Employees
Sponsors
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-01-24 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-12 9:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to JDL. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2240 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2240_.HTM |