HI SB2331 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-24 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-24 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows visiting licensed physicians traveling with a sports team or national sport governing body to provide medical treatment to team members and coaching staff under certain conditions without a Hawaii license to practice medicine.
Title
Visiting Physicians; Sports; Licensure; Exemption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-24 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-24-16 10:30AM in conference room 229. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-16 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Referred to CPH/EET. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2331&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2331_.HTM |