HI SB2333 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-28 - Act 029, 04/28/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1129).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-28 - Act 029, 04/28/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1129).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits marriage and family therapists licensed pursuant to chapter 451J, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to use the title "licensed marriage and family therapist". Makes conforming amendments. (SD1)
Title
Marriage and Family Therapists; Licensed Marriage and Family Therapists
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Senate | Act 029, 04/28/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1129). |
2016-04-28 | House | Act 029, on 04/28/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1129). |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 470). |
2016-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Hashem, Ing, Kong, Oshiro, Thielen excused (6). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-08 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1585-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-04-01 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Thielen. |
2016-03-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 04-01-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6). |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1198-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2016-03-16 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Creagan, Har, Hashem, Kawakami, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Brower, C. Lee, Nakashima, McDermott. |
2016-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled for decision-making on Wednesday, 03-16-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-14 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-16-16 2:00PM. |
2016-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-14-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-08 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 25 |
2016-03-04 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 31) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) English, Nishihara). Transmitted to House. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-16. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2492) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Slom. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-16 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1629 (Same As) 2016-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).