HI SB2333 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-27 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 688).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-27 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 688).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Legislative Reference Bureau to conduct a study on the feasibility of implementing the Hawaii Retirement Savings Program and to submit to the Legislature a report detailing its findings and proposals. If the results of the study are positive, a Hawaii Retirement Savings Board is established to administer the Hawaii Retirement Savings Program and the Hawaii Retirement Savings Program Administrative Fund. Requires the Board to annually report to the Governor and Legislature. Gives the Department of Budget and Finance interim rule making authority. Appropriates moneys. (SB2333 HD1)
Title
Relating To Retirement Savings.
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Thielen [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-27 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 688). |
2018-04-26 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-18 9:30AM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-26-18 9:30AM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-25-18 9:30AM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-24-18 10:00AM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-23-18 9:30AM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 788). |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Tokuda Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; English. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Holt Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, Ward. |
2018-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 778). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 504). |
2018-04-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1927-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Holt, Todd. |
2018-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-04-18 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1508-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-22 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matsumoto; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 03-22-18 9:15AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 148) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2704) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Shimabukuro. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-18 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | The committee on WAM has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 02-22-18 10:10AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-18 10:10AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Reported from LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2467) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, S. Chang, Ihara, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-18 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to LBR, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Hawaii Retirement Savings Board
Hawaii Retirement Savings Program
Market Analysis
Private Sector Employees
Hawaii Retirement Savings Board
Hawaii Retirement Savings Program
Market Analysis
Private Sector Employees