HI SB2344 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 28
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 28
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Addresses climate change adaptation by establishing the interagency sea level rise vulnerability and adaptation committee under the department of land and natural resources to create a sea level rise vulnerability and adaptation report that addresses sea level rise impacts statewide to 2050. Tasks the office of planning with establishing and implementing strategic climate adaptation plans and policy recommendations using the sea level rise vulnerability and adaptation report as a framework for addressing other statewide climate impacts identified under Act 286, Session Laws of Hawaii 2012. Appropriates funds for staffing and resources. (SD1)
Title
Majority Package; Climate Change Adaptation Planning; Interagency Sea Level Rise Vulnerability and Adaptation Committee; Appropriation. ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 163) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kouchi). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2554) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-14 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Reported from ENE/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2402) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Galuteria, Dela Cruz, Ihara, Ruderman, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Slom. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-14 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to ENE/WTL, WAM. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1714 (Same As) 2014-06-13 - Act 083, 6/9/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1183).