HI SB2344 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 2:05PM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 2:05PM in conference room 325.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the provisions for a minor to consent to no-cost emergency shelter and related services to include requiring a provider to be licensed and in compliance with zoning and safety regulations. Requires DHS to make every effort to have a shelter for minors on each island. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Minors.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 2:05PM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-17-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-03-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Thielen excused (3). |
2020-03-13 | House | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1045-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2020-03-11 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Wednesday, 03-11-20 10:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to HSH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 212) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3160) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-24-20 12:00PM in conference room 016. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2806) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Fevella. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-20 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to HMS, JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |