HI SB2371 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-17 - (H) Act 115, on 5/17/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 329).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-17 - (H) Act 115, on 5/17/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 329).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes limited benefit health insurance from insurance code provisions covering accident and health or sickness insurance contracts, with certain exceptions. Effective upon approval. (CD1)
Title
Limited Benefit Health Insurance
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-17 | (H) Act 115, on 5/17/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 329). | |
2010-05-17 | (S) Act 115, 5/17/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 573). | |
2010-05-03 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2010-04-28 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 630). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 645). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Awana, Sagum, Souki excused (3). | |
2010-04-27 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-26 | (S) Deferred until 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-26 | (H) Deferred to Tuesday, 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-22 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-22 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-22 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 93-10) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2010-04-22 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 93-10). | |
2010-04-22 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Herkes, Nishimoto, Wakai; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Marumoto. | |
2010-04-22 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Baker, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2010-04-21 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-10 1:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2010-04-16 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-21-10 2:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2010-04-15 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-16-10 1:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 557). | |
2010-04-12 | (H) House conferees appointed: Yamane, Herkes Co-Chairs; Nishimoto, Wakai, Marumoto. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 534). | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 533). | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Ige, Chair; Baker, Co-Chair(s); Espero, Hemmings. | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Deferred until 04-08-10. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 352). | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hanohano excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-06-10. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1132-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-29 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Wakai, Belatti, Cabanilla, Ito, Karamatsu, Luke, McKelvey, Souki, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marumoto, Thielen; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Herkes, Carroll, Mizuno, Morita. | |
2010-03-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-29-10 2:05PM in House conference room 325. | |
2010-03-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Finnegan, Manahan, M. Oshiro excused (4). | |
2010-03-18 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 822-10), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | |
2010-03-16 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Nishimoto, Bertram, Brower, Mizuno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll, Shimabukuro, Finnegan. | |
2010-03-12 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-16-10 9:30AM in House conference room 329. | |
2010-03-04 | (H) Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 37 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 138) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Bunda). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2520) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-02-19 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Espero, Green, Ihara, Sakamoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-19-10 9:15AM in conference room 229. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2067) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. | |
2010-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Green, Baker, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2010-01-29 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-01-10 2:30pm in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-10 2:45pm in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Referred to HTH, CPN. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Introduced. |