HI SB2386 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-21 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-21 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a criminal offense for advertising the sale of stolen property with the intent to commit theft. Effective 07/01/2050. (SD1)
Title
Theft; Advertising Sale of Stolen Property
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Thielen [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3). |
2014-03-21 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1109-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2014-03-19 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Creagan, Evans, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, Tsuji, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Ito, McDermott. |
2014-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-19-14 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2014-03-17 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-19-14. |
2014-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-17-14 2:10PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 175) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2590) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Solomon. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-24-14 10:15AM in conference room 016. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2085) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-14 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDL. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |