HI SB2386 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-09 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-09 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes presidential preference primary elections for the 2028 election cycle. Takes effect 6/1/2027.
Title
Relating To Elections.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-09 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-24 9:30AM; CR 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2386&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2386_.HTM |