HI SB2387 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Act 185, 07/01/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1287).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Act 185, 07/01/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1287).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Beginning with the 2017-2018 school year, requires a child to provide written documentation of a physical examination performed within twelve months prior to attending seventh grade at a public school. Requires DOH to provide information to assist students who do not complete the physical exam before December 31 of the seventh grade year and also requires DOH to provide consultations with those students' parents and guardians about health lifestyles and obtaining health insurance. (CD1)
Title
Physical Examination; Education; Health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Senate | Act 185, 07/01/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1287). |
2016-07-01 | House | Act 185, on 07/01/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1287). |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 43-16). |
2016-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16. |
2016-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 43-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Belatti, Cullen, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Baker, Dela Cruz; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-27-16 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-16 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 621). |
2016-04-19 | House | House conferee(s) discharged: Representative(s) Say. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613). |
2016-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 653). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takumi, Belatti, Cullen Co-Chairs; Say, Matsumoto. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Baker, Dela Cruz Co-Chairs. |
2016-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649). |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Deferred until 04-14-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Deferred until 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 400). |
2016-04-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Oshiro, Thielen, Tupola excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1471-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-30 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-30-16 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-03-24 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6). |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1293-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-03-23 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan. |
2016-03-22 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-03-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-23-16 8:45AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-03-18 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on HLT with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Kawakami, Kong, Tokioka excused (4). |
2016-03-18 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1082-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HLT. |
2016-03-16 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Choy, Ichiyama, Ing, Ito, Say, Tsuji, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Kong, Tupola. |
2016-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 03-16-16 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to EDN, HLT, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 151) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2816) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Chun Oakland, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-16 9:40AM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Reported from EDU/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2446) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-16 12:30PM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Referred to EDU/CPH, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1948 (Same As) 2016-01-27 - Referred to HLT, EDN, referral sheet 2