HI SB2392 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - (S) The committee on LBR deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - (S) The committee on LBR deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a family leave insurance fund to be administered by DLIR under the workers' compensation statute. Amends the definition of injuries covered under the workers' compensation statute to include family leave.
Title
Workers' Compensation; Family Leave Insurance
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Dwight Takamine [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-09 | (S) The committee on LBR deferred the measure. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) The committee on HMS deferred the measure. | |
2010-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS/LBR has rescheduled its public hearing to 2/9/2010 3:30:00 PM in conference room 224. | |
2010-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS/LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-10 3:30pm in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Referred to HMS/LBR, WAM. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2258 (Same As) 2010-02-03 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Marumoto voting no (1) and none excused (0).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2392&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB2392_.HTM |