HI SB2402 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - The committee on TRS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - The committee on TRS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides the department of transportation with more flexibility and discretion to address substantial hardship situations that impact airport concession contracts.
Title
Relating To Concessions.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | The committee on TRS deferred the measure. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS deferred the measure until 02-17-22 3:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-22 3:30PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TRS,WAM . |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1953 (Same As) 2022-04-29 - Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 935).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2402&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB2402_.HTM |