HI SB242 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the sale of air conditioning from seawater air conditioning district cooling systems to qualify for state enterprise zone benefits. (SB242 HD2)
Title
Enterprise Zones; Seawater Air Conditioning Cooling System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-04-30 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-09 1:30PM in conference room 225. | |
2009-04-28 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-30-09 1:00pm in conference room 225. | |
2009-04-24 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-28-09 2:15pm in conference room 225. | |
2009-04-22 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-24-09 1:00pm in conference room 225. | |
2009-04-20 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 710). | |
2009-04-20 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 655). | |
2009-04-20 | (H) House conferees appointed: Morita, McKelvey, M. Oshiro Co-Chairs; Coffman, Ching. | |
2009-04-17 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Gabbard, Chair; Kim, Co-Chair(s); Hemmings. | |
2009-04-16 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 650). | |
2009-04-16 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2009-04-16 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 438). | |
2009-04-14 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla, Morita, Takai excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-04-09 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-14-09. | |
2009-04-09 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1735) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-08 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, C. Lee, Sagum, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pine, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Nishimoto, Wooley. | |
2009-04-08 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-08-09 4:30pm in House conference room 308. | |
2009-03-27 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Chang, Herkes, McKelvey, Pine, Takai, Tokioka excused. | |
2009-03-25 | (H) Reported from EBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1280) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2009-03-24 | (H) The committees on EBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Evans, Tokioka, Tsuji, Wooley, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Berg, Manahan, Wakai. | |
2009-03-20 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EBM on Tuesday, 03-24-09 7:00am in House conference room 312. | |
2009-03-20 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on EBM with none voting no (0) and Chang, McKelvey, Morita, Takai, Thielen excused (5). | |
2009-03-19 | (H) Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1076), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EBM. | |
2009-03-17 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Morita, Coffman, Chang, Chong, Ito, C. Lee, Luke, Sagum, Ching; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Har, Herkes. | |
2009-03-13 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-17-09 8:30 AM in House conference room 325. | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Referred to EEP, EBM, FIN, referral sheet 27 | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 127) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2009-03-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-09. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 813) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2009-03-02 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Fukunaga, Galuteria, Hooser, Kidani, Tokuda, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Hee, Kokubun. | |
2009-02-26 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-09 9:30 AM in conference room 211. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 311) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2009-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Hooser, Kokubun; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) English, Hemmings; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Ihara. | |
2009-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-09 2:45pm in conference room 225. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to ENE, WAM. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB424 (Same As) 2010-02-04 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and none excused (0).