HI SB242 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows electronic copies, as an alternative to printed copies, of a bill to be made available for members of a house in which the bill is being voted upon for third or final reading in fulfillment of the 48-hour availability requirement.
Title
Constitutional Amendment; Electronic Copy; 48-hour Availability; Third or Final Reading (ConAm)
Sponsors
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-03-03 | Senate | The committee on JDL deferred the measure. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-03-15 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=242&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB242_.HTM |