HI SB2420 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-04 - (H) Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 37
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-04 - (H) Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 37
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the exemption for dietary supplements from the deposit beverage container program; adds hard spirits, and wine containers; effective date 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Deposit Beverage Container Program; Dietary Supplements
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Bunda [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
Sen. Fred Hemmings [R] | Sen. Gary Hooser [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-04 | (H) Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 37 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 158) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2529) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Fukunaga, Galuteria, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-10 10:10AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2086) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Green, Hooser, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Ihara, Kokubun. | |
2010-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE deferred the measure until 02-04-10 2:45pm in conference room 225. | |
2010-01-29 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-10 3:30pm in conference room 225. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Referred to ENE, WAM. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Introduced. |