HI SB2442 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 26
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 26
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes activities of Children and Youth Day as an official state event. (SD1)
Title
Children and Youth Day; State Event
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 168) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2684) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Chun Oakland, Inouye, Riviere, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Taniguchi. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-16 9:40AM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Reported from HMS/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2405) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ihara, Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Slom. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 02-16-16 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Riviere, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Harimoto, Slom. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-16 2:00PM in conference room 016. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HMS/GVO, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1725 (Same As) 2016-02-17 - The committee(s) on LMG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.