HI SB2445 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-07 - (S) The committee on PGM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-07 - (S) The committee on PGM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes each county to establish a retail sales tax of up to two per cent on sales of tangible personal property from a retailer to a consumer; requires the retail sales tax to take effect two years after the date of the adoption of the tax in that county.
Title
Counties; Retail Sales Tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-07 | (S) The committee on PGM deferred the measure. | |
2012-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-12 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to PGM, WAM. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2445 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2445_.HTM |