HI SB249 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-27 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-27 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Beginning with fiscal year 2016-2017, requires reimbursements from a non-general or federal fund to the general fund for the annual required contribution made for state employees and retirees whose compensation is or was paid from the non-general or federal fund. Effective 01/07/2059. (SD1)
Title
Hawaii Employer-union Health Benefits Trust Fund; Annual Required Contribution, Non-general or Federal Fund Reimbursement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-27 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 6) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-15 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |