HI SB2506 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-10 - (S) The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-10 - (S) The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Bans drug or device manufacturers or any wholesale distributor of medical devices from offering gifts to health care providers, unless excepted. Requires disclosure of permissible gifts to the director of commerce and consumer affairs. Makes disclosures publicly available.
Title
Gifts; Drug or Device Manufacturers; Health Care Providers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-10 | (S) The committee on HTH deferred the measure. | |
2010-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-10-10 2:45PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-10 2:45pm in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Referred to HTH, CPN. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2506&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB2506_.HTM |