HI SB251 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB251
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes requirements and permitting procedures for transportation network companies operating in the State. Makes permanent insurance requirements for transportation network companies and transportation network drivers. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Transportation Network Companies.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] |
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1422) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-03-23 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 181) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 642) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-23-21 9:30AM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 511) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, English, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS deferred the measure until 02-16-21 3:01PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-21 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to TRS, CPN. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB251 (Carry Over) 2021-03-25 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
HB264 (Same As) 2021-07-01 - Act 132, on 06/30/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1234).
HB264 (Same As) 2021-07-01 - Act 132, on 06/30/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1234).