HI SB2523 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-31 - Notice of Intent to veto dated 08-31-20 (Gov. Msg. No. 1119)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-31 - Notice of Intent to veto dated 08-31-20 (Gov. Msg. No. 1119)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Public Safety to expend certain appropriated funds during fiscal year 2020-2021 solely for the community-based work furlough program for female inmates. Effective retroactively to 6/30/2020. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Public Safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-30 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-31 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 08-31-20 (Gov. Msg. No. 1119) |
2020-08-31 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1119) |
2020-07-13 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2020-07-10 | House | Received notice of Senate agreement and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 632). |
2020-07-10 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2020-07-08 | Senate | One Day Notice 07-10-20. |
2020-07-08 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 07-10-20. |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 401). |
2020-07-06 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-07-02 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 07-06-20. |
2020-07-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1277-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-06-30 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2020-06-30 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 06-30-20 2:05PM in House conference room 329. |
2020-06-29 | House | Re-referred to PVM, FIN, referral sheet 51 |
2020-05-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1). |
2020-05-11 | House | Reported from PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1103-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2020-03-13 | House | The committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Nishimoto, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Gates. |
2020-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PVM on Friday, 03-13-20 10:00AM in House conference room 430. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to PVM, JUD, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 271) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3280) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-27-20 10:15AM in conference room 016. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2732) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Fevella. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-20 1:35PM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Community Correctional Centers
Correctional Facilities
Corrections
Director of Public Safety
PSD
Work Furlough Program
Correctional Facilities
Corrections
Director of Public Safety
PSD
Work Furlough Program