HI SB2600 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 26
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 26
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires state ethics commission advisory opinions to be approved and signed by a majority of the commission members. Takes effect on 1/7/2059. (SD1)
Title
State Ethics Commission; Advisory Opinions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 205) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2671) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, K.Kahele, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-29-16 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |