HI SB2603 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Human Services to establish and implement a Child Care Provider Subsidy and Bonus Program to provide subsidies to retain the existing child care workforce in licensed infant and toddler child care centers and group child care centers and bonuses to registered family child care homes. Requires annual reports to the Legislature. Declares that the general fund expenditure ceiling is exceeded. Makes appropriations. Takes effect 12/31/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Early Child Care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2469) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HHS, WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1964 (Same As) 2024-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-24 4:55 PM; CR 329.
Subjects
Appropriations ($)
Child Care Worker Subsidy and Bonus Program
DHS
Expenditure Ceiling
Family Child Care Homes
Group Child Care Centers
Infant and Toddler Child Care Centers
Reports
Child Care Worker Subsidy and Bonus Program
DHS
Expenditure Ceiling
Family Child Care Homes
Group Child Care Centers
Infant and Toddler Child Care Centers
Reports