HI SB2638 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 26
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 26
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates money to the state building code council. Effective 7/1/2076. (SD1)
Title
Appropriation; State Building Code Council ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Sam Slom [R] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 215) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2702) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-16 1:40PM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2184) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ihara, Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-16 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2051 (Same As) 2016-04-29 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-29-16 at 5:25PM in Conference Room 309.