HI SB2647 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-24 - Act 125, on 06/23/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1226).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-24 - Act 125, on 06/23/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1226).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale, offer to sell, purchase, trade, possession with intent to sell, or barter of any part or product from various animal and marine species. Provides exceptions to this prohibition, including for traditional cultural practices protected under the State Constitution. Imposes penalties for violations of the prohibition on trafficking animal parts and products. (SB2647 HD2)
Title
Wildlife; Species; Trafficking; Fines
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-24 | House | Act 125, on 06/23/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1226). |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Act 125, 06/23/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1226). |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 717). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker, English, Slom, Taniguchi . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-16 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | The Senate Conference Managers recommend that the Senate agree to the House amendments. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | The Senate Conference Managers have scheduled a decision making to agree to the House amendments on 04-28-16 2:31PM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-26 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 705). |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Galuteria. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Evans, Pouha. |
2016-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649). |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 558). |
2016-04-12 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, Thielen excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-08 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1691-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-29 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, C. Lee, McDermott, Thielen. |
2016-03-29 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-29-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6). |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1254-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2016-03-18 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, Ing, C. Lee, Lowen, Say, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Pouha. |
2016-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 03-18-16 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-02-23 | House | Referred to WAL, JUD, referral sheet 21 |
2016-02-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-02-22 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 26) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 15; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, K.Kahele, Nishihara, Riviere, Shimabukuro . Noes, 7 (Senator(s) Baker, English, Inouye, Kidani, Kim, Slom, Taniguchi). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Galuteria, Harimoto, Keith-Agaran). Transmitted to House. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-22-16. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Reported from WLA/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2443) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLA were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Dela Cruz, Riviere, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Wakai, Slom. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-11-16 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-16 3:20PM in conference room 224. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Re-Referred to WLA/JDL. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to WLA/JDL, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |