HI SB266 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB266
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-01 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-01 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires travel agencies that operate as sole proprietorships to file proof of professional liability and errors and omissions insurance as a condition of registration or renewal.
Title
Relating To Travel Agencies.
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] |
Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-01 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-01-17 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to ETT, CPH. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB266 (Carry Over) 2017-03-01 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=266&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SB266_.HTM |