HI SB2664 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to AGR, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to AGR, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a classification of agricultural public lands entitled "taro lands". Appropriates funds to the Land Use Commission to create an inventory of lands classified as taro lands. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To The Protection Of Taro.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to AGR, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 289) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3086) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported from AEN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2621) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN/WTL, WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |