HI SB2738 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Act 082, 06/29/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1183).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Act 082, 06/29/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1183).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that found electronic devices that may contain personal information shall be sanitized before they are provided to finders or disposed of by public auction or other means. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Found Electronic Devices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-05 | Senate | Act 082, 06/29/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1183). |
2018-07-05 | House | Act 082, on 06/29/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1183). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2018-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 63-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 63-18). |
2018-04-23 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Nishimoto, Cullen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, McDermott. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Inouye, English; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 631). |
2018-04-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-23-18 2:00PM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-19 | House | House Conferees Added: Representative Cullen added as Co-Chair. |
2018-04-19 | House | Re-referred to CPC, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 62 |
2018-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 794). |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; Inouye, English Co-Chairs. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takumi, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Morikawa, McDermott. |
2018-04-06 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 574). |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 463). |
2018-04-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Holt, C. Lee, LoPresti, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (6). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-05 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1855-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-03-29 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, McDermott. |
2018-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-29-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2018-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, C. Lee, Souki excused (3). |
2018-03-20 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1228-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2018-03-14 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Johanson, LoPresti, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2018-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-14-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 281) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2838) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Shimabukuro. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-18 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Reported from PSM/TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2320) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Espero, English, Harimoto, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Ihara. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-18 10:15AM in conference room 225. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM/TRE, WAM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2311 (Same As) 2018-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2).