HI SB2745 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 286, 7/9/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1403).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 286, 7/9/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1403).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a climate change adaptation policy for the State of Hawaii by amending the Hawaii State Planning Act to include climate change adaptation priority guidelines. (CD1)
Title
Planning Act; Priority Guidelines; Climate Change
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-10 | (S) Act 286, 7/9/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1403). | |
2012-07-10 | (H) Act 286, on 7/9/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1403). | |
2012-05-08 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2012-05-02 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 720). | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 831). | |
2012-05-01 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2012-04-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-12. | |
2012-04-26 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-01-12. | |
2012-04-26 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 11-12) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2012-04-26 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 11-12). | |
2012-04-23 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Coffman, Chang, Kawakami, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ito. | |
2012-04-23 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Dela Cruz, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Nishihara. | |
2012-04-19 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-23-12 10:00AM in conference room 225. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 752). | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Gabbard, Chair; Dela Cruz, Co-Chair(s); Ihara, Nishihara, Solomon. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Coffman, Chang, Kawakami Co-Chairs; Ito, Thielen. | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 679). | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 477). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tueday, 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1650-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-04-04 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2012-04-02 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-03-31 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-03-12 6:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Chang, Herkes, Nakashima, Pine, Tokioka excused (5). | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Reported from EEP/WLO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1110-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-15 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, Har, Coffman, Kawakami, Nakashima, Riviere, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Herkes, Ito. | |
2012-03-15 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Coffman, Kawakami, Chang, Har, Nakashima, Riviere, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Herkes, Ito. | |
2012-03-12 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WLO on Thursday, 03-15-12 9:45AM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to EEP/WLO, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 277) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Reported from ENE/WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2447) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2012-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, English, Green, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Ryan, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Tokuda, Slom. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE/WLH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-23-12 2:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Referred to ENE/WLH. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2483 (Same As) 2012-04-16 - (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 754).