HI SB2787 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Lamosao, Garrett, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) M. Mizuno.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Lamosao, Garrett, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) M. Mizuno.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes within the Department of Labor and Industrial Relations' Office of Community Services the Immigration Services and Access Unit. Appropriates funds for the unit, including for new positions. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Immigration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Lamosao, Garrett, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) M. Mizuno. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-24 10:01AM; Conference Room 016. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 759). |
2024-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Matayoshi, Lamosao Co-Chairs; Garrett, M. Mizuno, Alcos. |
2024-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 678). |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Aquino Chair; Kanuha Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2024-04-05 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 489). |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 577). |
2024-04-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Souza excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1752-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-03-28 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa, Aiu, Cochran, Lamosao. |
2024-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-24 3:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Hashem, Kong, Sayama excused (4). |
2024-03-19 | House | Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1169-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-03-14 | House | The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Martinez, Tam; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Kapela, Sayama, Alcos. |
2024-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Thursday, 03-14-24 9:15AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 203) in amended form (SD 2). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2910) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2024-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2024-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-24 10:01AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Reported from LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2276) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Moriwaki, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella, Lee. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to LBT, WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
DLIR
Expenditure Ceiling
Immigration
Immigration and Services Access Unit
Office of Community Services
Positions
DLIR
Expenditure Ceiling
Immigration
Immigration and Services Access Unit
Office of Community Services
Positions