HI SB2800 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-26 - (S) Act 163, 6/26/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1266).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-26 - (S) Act 163, 6/26/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1266).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds exemptions for any kindergarten, school, or program licensed by the charter school review panel, the Hawaii Council of Private Schools, or any federal agency and certain child care programs conducted by the counties from child care licensing by the department of human services. Effective July 1, 2013. (CD1)
Title
Child Care Licensing; Exemptions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-26 | (S) Act 163, 6/26/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1266). | |
2012-06-26 | (H) Act 163, on 6/26/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1266). | |
2012-05-08 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2012-05-02 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 720). | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 831). | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marumoto excused (1). | |
2012-05-01 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-04-27 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-12. | |
2012-04-27 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 77-12). | |
2012-04-27 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-01-12. | |
2012-04-27 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 77-12) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2012-04-27 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Takumi, Jordan, Belatti; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pine. | |
2012-04-27 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-04-26 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-12 10:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2012-04-24 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-12 10:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2012-04-20 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-12 10:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2012-04-18 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-12 3:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 752). | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Chun Oakland, Chair; Tokuda, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Mizuno, Takumi, Jordan Co-Chairs; Belatti, Pine. | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 679). | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 501). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1688-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: C. Lee. | |
2012-03-28 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-03-27 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-29-12 10:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes excused (1). | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1222-12), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Belatti, Aquino, Awana, Hanohano, Mizuno, Nakashima, Nishimoto, Saiki, Takai, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Chang, Wooley. | |
2012-03-15 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 03-19-12 2:15PM in House conference room 309. | |
2012-03-15 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, Souki excused (2). | |
2012-03-15 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1009-12), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDN. | |
2012-03-12 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Mizuno, Jordan, Belatti, Hanohano, C. Lee, Morikawa, Yamane, Ching; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Wooley, Pine. | |
2012-03-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Monday, 03-12-12 8:30AM in House conference room 329. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to HUS, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 316) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Reported from HMS/EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2442) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2012-02-21 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. | |
2012-02-21 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Taniguchi. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-21-12 1:00PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Referred to HMS/EDU. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2538 (Same As) 2012-02-07 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai excused (1).