HI SB281 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-05 - (H) Act 185, on 7/5/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1289).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-05 - (H) Act 185, on 7/5/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1289).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the use or rental of division of animal industry property or facilities for commercial purposes. Establishes the animal industry special fund. (CD1)
Title
Quarantine Facilities; Commercial Use; Special Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Pohai Ryan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-05 | (H) Act 185, on 7/5/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1289). | |
2011-07-05 | (S) Act 185, 7/5/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1289). | |
2011-05-06 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2011-05-05 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 702). | |
2011-05-04 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 694). | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Pine excused (2). | |
2011-05-03 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 23 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 7) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2011-04-28 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 7). | |
2011-04-26 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Hashem, Awana, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-26 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kidani, Dela Cruz; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. | |
2011-04-25 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-26-11 9:00AM in conference room 224. | |
2011-04-21 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-25-11 3:30PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-21-11 9:00AM in conference room 224. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 652). | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-11 3:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 643). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House conferees appointed: Tsuji, Hashem Co-Chairs; Awana, Riviere. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Nishihara, Chair; Kidani, Co-Chair(s); Dela Cruz, Wakai. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 605). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 441). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Awana excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1553) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-06 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-04-04 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-06-11 3:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Belatti, Chang, Tokioka excused (3). | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1078) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-16 | (H) The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Hashem, Awana, Brower, Choy, Evans, McKelvey, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Marumoto, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-03-14 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-16-11 9:00AM in House conference room 312. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 119) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 775) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-03-01 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Fukunaga. | |
2011-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-01-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) Reported from AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 28) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kahele, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi, Slom. | |
2011-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL deferred the measure until 02-01-11 2:55PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-11 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to AGL, WAM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |