HI SB2823 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Act 091, 06/21/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1192).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Act 091, 06/21/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1192).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation Board of Directors to set the salary of the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation Executive Director in an amount not to exceed the salary of the Director of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism. (SB2823 HD1)
Title
Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation; Executive Director Salary
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-22 | Senate | Act 091, 06/21/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1192). |
2016-06-22 | House | Act 091, on 06/21/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1192). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2016-04-29 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 713). |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. 22 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Ruderman, Slom. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-29-16. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-29-16. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-16 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | The Senate Conference Managers recommend that the Senate agree to the House amendments. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Harimoto, Chun Oakland, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-16 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-16 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 620). |
2016-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 657). |
2016-04-19 | House | House conferee(s) replaced: Representative(s) McDermott replaced Representative(s) Ward as conferee(s). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Harimoto Chair; Chun Oakland, Galuteria Co-Chairs. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Hashem, Luke Co-Chairs; Kobayashi, Ward. |
2016-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649). |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 574). |
2016-04-12 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, Thielen excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-08 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1646-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-04-05 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-04-05 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-05-16 2:30PM in conference room 308. |
2016-04-01 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Tuesday, 04-05-16 at 2:30PM. |
2016-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 04-01-16 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-03-18 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Kawakami, Kong, Tokioka excused (4). |
2016-03-18 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1071-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-03-14 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Jordan, Creagan, Morikawa, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Kobayashi, Oshiro. |
2016-03-14 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Monday, 03-14-16 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-03-08 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 25 |
2016-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 71). |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 4 (Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Nishihara, Ruderman). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-04-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2636) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Inouye, Riviere, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Harimoto, Taniguchi. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-29-16 9:15AM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2248) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Harimoto, Galuteria, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Ihara, Slom. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU deferred the measure until 02-04-16 2:50PM in conference room 225. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-16 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2294 (Same As) 2016-01-29 - Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 4