HI SB2853 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Act 140, on 06/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1242).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Act 140, on 06/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1242).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adopts the National Association of Insurance Commissioners (NAIC) Risk Management and Own Risk and Solvency Assessment Model Act. Applies certain requirements for risk-based capital provisions, severability, and notice provisions to risk retention captive insurance companies. Incorporates revisions to the NAIC Model Risk Retention Act. (CD1)
Title
Insurance; Risk Management and Own Risk and Solvency Assessment Act; Captive Insurance Companies; Model Risk Retention Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | House | Act 140, on 06/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1242). |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Act 140, 06/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1242). |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 74-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 74-16). |
2016-04-29 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Cachola, Woodson, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-16 2:30PM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-16 2:30PM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613). |
2016-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 653). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Cachola Co-Chairs; Woodson, Fukumoto Chang. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Taniguchi Co-Chair; Slom. |
2016-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649). |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 584). |
2016-04-12 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, McDermott, Thielen excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-08 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1634-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-04-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 04-01-16 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6). |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1202-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-03-21 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Kawakami, Yamane. |
2016-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-21-16 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2016-03-16 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-21-16 2:00PM. |
2016-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-16-16 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 276) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2586) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-19-16 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-16 9:15AM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2044) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-16 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2324 (Same As) 2016-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).