HI SB2854 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Act 141, on 06/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1243).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Act 141, on 06/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1243).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes various amendments in the Insurance Code relating to property insurance, market conduct, insurance premium taxes, insurance contracts, accident and health or sickness insurance, claim filing, captive insurance companies, duty to respond, mental health and alcohol and drug abuse treatment insurance benefits, Hawaii hurricane relief fund, covered services, mutual benefit societies, and health maintenance organizations. (CD1)
Title
Property Insurance; Premium Tax; Electronic Filing; Electronic Payments; Short-term Health Policies; Child Health Supervision Services; Claim Filer; Risk Retention; Captive Insurance; Mental Illness Benefits; Duty to Respond; Visual or Optometric Services Coverage; Surgical or Emergency Services Coverage; Contraceptive Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | House | Act 141, on 06/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1243). |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Act 141, 06/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1243). |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 73-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 73-16). |
2016-04-29 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Cachola, Woodson, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-16 2:30PM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-16 2:30PM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613). |
2016-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 653). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Cachola Co-Chairs; Woodson, Fukumoto Chang. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Taniguchi Co-Chair; Slom. |
2016-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649). |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Deferred until 04-14-16. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 494). |
2016-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Hashem, Ing, Kong, Oshiro, Thielen excused (6). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1590-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-04-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 04-01-16 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6). |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1302-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-03-23 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, Oshiro. |
2016-03-22 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-23-16 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2016-03-21 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-23-16 at 2:00 PM. |
2016-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-21-16 3:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 277) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2587) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Taniguchi, Wakai. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-16 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2259) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-11-16 10:30AM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-03-16 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2325 (Same As) 2016-02-10 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.