HI SB2890 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-14 - (S) The committee on PGM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-14 - (S) The committee on PGM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows privately funded industrial hemp research to be conducted in Hawaii under certain conditions; requires monitoring by department of public safety; requires reporting to county law enforcement; exempts agronomic data derived from research from public records disclosure; confers immunity from criminal prosecution for the research. Effective 7/1/2050.
Title
Industrial Hemp; Research
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | (S) The committee on PGM deferred the measure. | |
2012-02-14 | (S) The committee on EDT deferred the measure. | |
2012-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT/PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-12 2:50PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Referred to EDT/PGM, JDL. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2890 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2890_.HTM |