HI SB2891 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - The committee on TCA deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - The committee on TCA deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Transportation to allow helicopter operations during daylight hours at Kapalua airport.
Title
Relating To The Department Of Transportation.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | Senate | The committee on TCA deferred the measure. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-24 3:01PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TCA, WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1621 (Same As) 2024-02-05 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 02-06-24 10:00AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2891&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2891_.HTM |