HI SB2978 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-10 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-10 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a tax deduction for the amount of interisland airplane carrier landing fees and terminal facility lease rents paid in any county with a population of less than 500,000 persons.
Title
Interisland Airplane Carrier; Tax Deduction; Landing Fee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2012-02-10 | (S) Reported from TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2100) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2012-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TIA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Espero, Gabbard, Kahele, Kouchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom. | |
2012-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-12 1:15PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Referred to TIA, WAM. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |